House | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:02PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2). | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 01-30-24 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to TOU, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Prefiled. |