Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1666 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1666 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO SMOKING. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1666
44 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88
99 H.B. NO.
1010
1111 1666
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO SMOKING.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. Chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows: "§328J- Prohibition on sidewalks; designated smoking areas; pilot program. (a) The department shall establish on public sidewalks, as defined in section 291C-1, designated smoking areas with ashtrays, no later than December 31, 2024. (b) Beginning January 1, 2025, smoking shall be prohibited on a public sidewalk, as defined in section 291C-1, unless the individual is within a designated smoking area." SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on January 1, 2027. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:
5050
5151 "§328J- Prohibition on sidewalks; designated smoking areas; pilot program. (a) The department shall establish on public sidewalks, as defined in section 291C-1, designated smoking areas with ashtrays, no later than December 31, 2024.
5252
5353 (b) Beginning January 1, 2025, smoking shall be prohibited on a public sidewalk, as defined in section 291C-1, unless the individual is within a designated smoking area."
5454
5555 SECTION 2. New statutory material is underscored.
5656
5757 SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on January 1, 2027.
5858
5959
6060
6161 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
6262
6363 INTRODUCED BY:
6464
6565 _____________________________
6666
6767
6868
6969
7070
7171 Report Title: DOH; Designated Smoking Areas; Public Sidewalks; Smoking; Prohibited Description: Requires the department of health to establish designated smoking areas on public sidewalks by 12/31/2024. Beginning 1/1/2025, prohibits smoking on public sidewalks unless within a designated smoking area. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
7272
7373
7474
7575 Report Title:
7676
7777 DOH; Designated Smoking Areas; Public Sidewalks; Smoking; Prohibited
7878
7979
8080
8181 Description:
8282
8383 Requires the department of health to establish designated smoking areas on public sidewalks by 12/31/2024. Beginning 1/1/2025, prohibits smoking on public sidewalks unless within a designated smoking area.
8484
8585
8686
8787
8888
8989
9090
9191 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.