Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1666 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2024

                            HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES   H.B. NO.   1666     THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024         STATE OF HAWAII                                A BILL FOR AN ACT     RELATING TO SMOKING.     BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:   

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H.B. NO. 1666
THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024
STATE OF HAWAII

HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

H.B. NO.

1666

THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2024

 

STATE OF HAWAII

 

 

 

 

 

 

A BILL FOR AN ACT

 

 

RELATING TO SMOKING.

 

 

BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:

 

      SECTION 1.  Chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:      "§328J-     Prohibition on sidewalks; designated smoking areas; pilot program.  (a)  The department shall establish on public sidewalks, as defined in section 291C-1, designated smoking areas with ashtrays, no later than December 31, 2024.      (b)  Beginning January 1, 2025, smoking shall be prohibited on a public sidewalk, as defined in section 291C-1, unless the individual is within a designated smoking area."      SECTION 2.  New statutory material is underscored.      SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on January 1, 2027.      INTRODUCED BY:   _____________________________              

     SECTION 1.  Chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:

     "§328J-     Prohibition on sidewalks; designated smoking areas; pilot program.  (a)  The department shall establish on public sidewalks, as defined in section 291C-1, designated smoking areas with ashtrays, no later than December 31, 2024.

     (b)  Beginning January 1, 2025, smoking shall be prohibited on a public sidewalk, as defined in section 291C-1, unless the individual is within a designated smoking area."

     SECTION 2.  New statutory material is underscored.

     SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect upon its approval and shall be repealed on January 1, 2027.

 

INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________

INTRODUCED BY:

_____________________________

 

 

    Report Title: DOH; Designated Smoking Areas; Public Sidewalks; Smoking; Prohibited   Description: Requires the department of health to establish designated smoking areas on public sidewalks by 12/31/2024.  Beginning 1/1/2025, prohibits smoking on public sidewalks unless within a designated smoking area.       The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent. 

 

Report Title:

DOH; Designated Smoking Areas; Public Sidewalks; Smoking; Prohibited

 

Description:

Requires the department of health to establish designated smoking areas on public sidewalks by 12/31/2024.  Beginning 1/1/2025, prohibits smoking on public sidewalks unless within a designated smoking area.

 

 

 

The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.