House | 02/14/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-09-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Pending introduction. |