Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 100, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2024
|
Act 100, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 110-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 110-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti, Sayama, Poepoe; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno, Takenouchi, Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 820).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-24 1:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Conferees Added: Representative Poepoe added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to WAL/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 781).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Wakai, Keohokalole Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Belatti, Sayama Co-Chairs; M. Mizuno, Takenouchi, Garcia.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 477) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3413) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3199) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS/PSM, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from WAL/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Kobayashi, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HLT on Thursday, 02-08-24 8:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to WAL/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|