Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1836 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 27, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024