Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Evslin, Tarnas, Aiu Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Miyake, Takayama, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 34
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye, Kim, Richards. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3693) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPN/EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/EET/GVO deferred the measure until 03-20-24 9:35AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Re-Referred to CPN/EET/GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPN/EET/PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 234).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong, Souza voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Evslin). Excused, 2 (Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Floor Amendment No. 2 offered by Rep. Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Souza; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-29-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to HSG, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|