Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024
Bill March 2, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024