House | 02/02/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-31-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Pending introduction. |