Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Act 020, 05/13/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Act 020, on 05/13/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 802).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kong, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 781).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3208) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|