Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 2, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024