Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS/EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Lowen, Nakashima, Quinlan, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|