Senate
|
07/09/2024
|
Vetoed on 07-09-24 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2024
|
Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 56-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 56-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Aquino, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Nakashima, Takenouchi, Morikawa, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 9:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 773).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Changed: Representative Morikawa discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. Representative Takenouchi discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Nakashima, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Takenouchi, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Aquino, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3144) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-14-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 131).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-02-24 2:05PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|