Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024