Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Act 054, 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Act 054, on 06/20/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keohokalole, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Cochran, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 727).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Cochran, Sayama, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 481) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3414) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-27-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|