Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024