House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Pierick voting no (6) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from JHA/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 208-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/HLT on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to JHA/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|