Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 738) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3912) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kapela, Perruso, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1741-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Matayoshi, Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kapela, Marten, Matsumoto, Perruso, Pierick, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|