House | 03/28/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | To be offered. |