12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee on EET deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on EET/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to EET/LBT, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |