Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2535) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |