LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2596
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2596
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2596
Action History
Senate
02/05/2024
The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Senate
02/05/2024
The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Senate
02/02/2024
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/24/2024
Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Senate
01/22/2024
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/19/2024
Introduced.