House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Chun, Gates, La Chica, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Garrett, Holt, Kila, Kong, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Miyake, Pierick, Sayama, Tam, Ward voting no (15) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Holt, Kong, Miyake, Souza; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Amato, Chun, Garrett, Gates, La Chica, Lamosao, Matsumoto, Poepoe, Sayama, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Matayoshi, Miyake, Souza, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1268-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Evslin, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Matsumoto; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kila, Miyake; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2992) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Elefante, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Elefante; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|