House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 169) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3031) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to LBT, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|