Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee on EET deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | The committee(s) on EET/GVO deferred the measure until 02-06-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |