Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2589) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 3:03PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Re-Referred to TCA/GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to TCA/PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced. |