Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 225, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 225, on 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Morikawa, Miyake, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tarnas, Lamosao.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 10:04AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 11:28 AM; 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 10:03AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Tarnas, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Lamosao, Miyake, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 690).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1803-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin, Ichiyama, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica, Lamosao.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-12-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to TOU, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 333) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2777) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2284) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced.
|
|
|