Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 745).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1909-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to TRN, referral sheet 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-04-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3535) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to TCA/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered.
|
|
|