House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 396) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3600) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kim. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to EET/WTL. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |