Senate | 05/31/2024 | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | One Day Notice 04-04-24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3573) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 04-01-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Re-Referred to AEN. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred to AEN/EET. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Offered. |