House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Tarnas, Grandinetti, Muraoka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Fukunaga, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 864).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keohokalole discharged as Co-Chair. Senator Fukunaga added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-25 10:30AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-25 9:00AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee, C. Chairs; Keohokalole, Chang Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kila, Tarnas, Grandinetti Co-Chairs; Muraoka.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 704).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-01-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, C., Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, DeCorte; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-13-25 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to TCA, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90).
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Shimizu voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lee, M., Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-25 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Matayoshi, Poepoe, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-12-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Muraoka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kong, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Grandinetti, Evslin, Kitagawa, La Chica, Miyake, Muraoka, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 01-28-25 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|