House
|
04/23/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 4:45PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; DeCoite, Gabbard, Richards, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Poepoe, Shimizu.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 705).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 775) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Chang, DeCoite, Inouye, McKelvey, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Floor Amendment No. 6 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1667) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chang ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-31-25 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-25 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Re-Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Iwamoto, Souza voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Pierick, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Pierick, Templo, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-20-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|