Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB698 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2025

Amended

Bill April 8, 2025
Bill April 3, 2025
Bill March 24, 2025
Bill February 26, 2025