Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey, Iwamoto, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 2:00 PM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 51).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Tarnas, Lamosao, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, Elefante, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-24-25 9:30AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Chang, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Elefante, Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 732).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Lamosao, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 704).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 670) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-03-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) DeCorte; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-25 1:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to WTL/HOU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 275).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-25.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-27-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 354) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lamosao, Belatti, Ichiyama, Iwamoto, Morikawa, Poepoe, Woodson, Shimizu, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-04-25 9:00AM in House conference room 411 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|