Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2025

Amended

Bill April 25, 2025
Bill April 4, 2025
Bill March 21, 2025
Bill February 28, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025