Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 104) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 104).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Sayama, Templo; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Aquino, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-25 9:31AM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-25 9:50AM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-25 10:03AM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Aquino, Kim Co-Chairs; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Sayama, Templo Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 774).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 617).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kapela excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1952), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Hussey, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Alcos, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-25 3:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kapela, Kitagawa, Ward excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kong, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-20-25 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt, Ward, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Templo, Holt, Hussey, Ilagan, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-11-25 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to TOU, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from EDT/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Lee, C., Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-25 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Referred to EDT/LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|