Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2025
Bill January 22, 2025

Amended

Bill April 25, 2025
Bill March 20, 2025
Bill March 12, 2025
Bill February 26, 2025
Bill February 12, 2025