House
|
04/11/2025
|
Act 013, on 04/10/2025 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 411).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey, Muraoka, Ward excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hussey, Templo, Ward excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Poepoe, Belatti, Hashem, Kahaloa, Perruso, Takayama, Todd, Garcia, Shimizu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-12-25 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
One Day Notice 02-28-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Chang, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Re-Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-25 9:15AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|