Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2025
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 821).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Iwamoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takenouchi, Morikawa, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 9:30AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 851).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Aquino Co-Chair; Hashimoto, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takenouchi Chair; Morikawa, Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 779).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 645).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Iwamoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Marten excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Grandinetti, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo, Reyes Oda; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-25 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 148) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Elefante, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-25 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 01-30-25 3:01PM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-25 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2025
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|