Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2025

Amended

Bill April 26, 2025
Bill April 3, 2025
Bill February 24, 2025
Bill February 7, 2025