House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Grandinetti, Perruso, Reyes Oda, Tam voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte, Rhoads). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-30-25.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 118).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M.; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, McKelvey, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-25 9:00AM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-25 9:00AM; Conference Room 411.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 851).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; McKelvey, Wakai Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House Conferees Appointed: Sayama, Lee, M. Co-Chairs; Reyes Oda.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 590).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 468).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Iwamoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Reyes Oda voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1917), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Takenouchi, Holt, Keohokapu-Lee Loy, Kitagawa, Kusch, Lamosao, Lee, M., Miyake, Morikawa, Templo; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Grandinetti, Alcos; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Reyes Oda; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-25 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Reyes Oda voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
The committee on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Lee, M., Garrett, Kapela, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Reyes Oda; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-13-25 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara, McKelvey, Richards. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCorte). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, C., Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-25 10:02AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from EDT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
The committee(s) on EDT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-25 1:03PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Referred to EDT/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Introduced.
|
|
|