Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Amended

Bill April 26, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025
Bill February 27, 2025
Bill February 13, 2025