House | 05/09/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 732. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 726. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 596. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 509. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 484. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 483. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Substituted for SF 239. S.J. 483. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 239. S.J. 378. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 378. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 407. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 390. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Amendment H-1019 adopted. H.J. 389. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Amendment H-1019 filed. H.J. 304. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 247. |