Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill February 22, 2023