House | 02/28/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 450. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2465. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 248. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee: Ingels, Cahill and Hora. H.J. 122. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 113. |