House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 906.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 932.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 2. S.J. 932.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 725.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2023 1:00PM Room 315.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee: Sweeney, Alons, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 570.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 551.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 551.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 596.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 585.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 411.
|
|
|