House | 05/12/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 952. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 890. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 888. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 883. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Substituted for SF 417. S.J. 883. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 417. S.J. 540. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 540. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 539. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 524. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Amendment H-1028 adopted. H.J. 523. | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Amendment H-1028 filed. H.J. 475. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 433. |