Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill March 7, 2023