House
|
05/03/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 716.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 711.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 709.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 4:00PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Subcommittee: Sweeney, Evans, and Knox. S.J. 46.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/31/2023
|
END OF [] ACTIONS
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 1092.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 520. S.J. 771.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 771.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 805.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 87, nays 10. H.J. 788.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment H-1147 adopted, as amended. H.J. 788.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment H-1159 to amendment H-1147 adopted. H.J. 788.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment H-1202 to amendment H-1147 filed, adopted. H.J. 788.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 746.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amendment H-1159 filed. H.J. 727.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment H-1147 filed. H.J. 709.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 480.
|
|
|