LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF572
Draft Versions
IA
Iowa House Bill HF572
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF572
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 13, 2023
Bill
March 2, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 4, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 11, 2023
Compare